GA SB191 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to courts, and Code Section 47-2-263 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to credit for certain past service as an assistant district attorney or employee of the Prosecuting Attorneys' Council, payment of employee contributions, and credit for service as a full-time law assistant, so as to rename law assistants as law clerks and staff attorneys; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Courts; law assistants as law clerks and staff attorneys; rename
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #105 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |