GA SB195 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to provide for consumer protections and freedom of information regarding prescription drug benefits; to provide for intent and applicability; to provide for definitions; to provide for requirements; to provide for an advisory committee; to provide for related matters; to provide for a short title; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Prescription Drug Benefits Freedom of Information and Consumer Protection Act"; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #425 (Y: 97 N: 60 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #318 (Y: 160 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #168 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #318 (Y: 160 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #168 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |