GA SB20 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 60 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to provisions applicable to counties and municipal corporations, so as to provide for the establishment of banking improvement zones to encourage opening of banks in areas underserved by banks; to provide for definitions; to provide for application and standards of approval for a banking improvement zone; to provide for the establishment of an agreement for the deposit of public funds in banks within a banking improvement zone; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Counties and Municipal Corporations; establishment of banking improvement zones; areas underserved; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #739 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #421 (Y: 157 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #70 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-01 Effective Date
2020-08-03 Act 549
2020-08-03SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2020-06-29SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2020-06-25HouseHouse Receded from Amend or Sub
2020-02-04SenateSenate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
2019-04-02HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-04-02HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-28HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-02-27SenateSenate Third Read
2019-02-14SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-02-13SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-01-17SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-01-16SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback