GA SB202 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 33-7-8 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to title insurance, so as to allow title insurance to be procured on a lender's security interest in personal property taken by the lender as collateral for a commercial loan; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Title Insurance; lender's security interest; personal property taken by the lender as collateral for a commercial loan; allow
Sponsors
Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] |
Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - House - House Vote #252 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #129 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #129 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 279 | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |