GA SB212 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-5-27 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to examination of applicants, so as to revise the criteria by which the Department of Driver Services shall authorize certain licensed driver training schools to administer the on-the-road driving skills testing; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Department of Driver Services; criteria; authorize certain licensed driver training schools to administer on-the-road driving skills testing; revise
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #353 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Vote #270 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #169 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Vote #270 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #169 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-02 | Act 145 | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-13 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |