GA SB213 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to campaign contributions, so as to revise the content of and certain reporting times for certain campaign disclosure reports; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Campaign Contributions; content of and certain reporting times for certain campaign disclosure reports; revise
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Heath [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] |
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. William Ligon [R] | Rep. Joseph Gullett [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #334 (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #372 (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #134 (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #156 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #372 (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #134 (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #156 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 297 | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |