GA SB214 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 10 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to barbers and cosmetologists, so as to change the number of apprenticeship hours required for cosmetologists, hair designers, estheticians, nail technicians, master barbers, and barbers II; to remove other requirements for certificates of registration; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Barbers and Cosmetologists; the number of apprenticeship hours required; change
Sponsors
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] |
Rep. Alan Powell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #433 (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #430 (Y: 151 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #369 (Y: 22 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #320 (Y: 162 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #171 (Y: 47 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #430 (Y: 151 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #369 (Y: 22 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #320 (Y: 162 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #171 (Y: 47 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-02 | Act 146 | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 32nd, 11th, 122nd |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 9th, 47th, 1st |
2019-04-02 | House | House Insisted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |