GA SB216 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to ad valorem taxation of property, so as to allow local governments to accept prepayments of ad valorem taxes; to provide for conditions, limitations, and procedures; to provide for an effective date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad Valorem Taxation; local governments to accept prepayments of ad valorem taxes; allow
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #330 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #283 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #134 (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #136 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #283 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #134 (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #136 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-26 | Act 58 | |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |