GA SB219 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 1 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to education, so as to require high school students and students seeking a general educational development (GED) diploma to correctly answer 60 percent of the questions on the United States Citizenship Civics Test for purposes of being eligible to receive a high school diploma or a general educational development (GED) diploma; to provide for multiple attempts; to provide for certification of scores; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; general educational development (GED) diploma; correctly answer 60 percent questions on the US Citizenship Civics Test; require
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Jordan [D] | Sen. Sheikh Rahman [D] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Sen. Nikema Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #175 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |