GA SB222 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 17 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to criminal procedure, so as to create the Georgia Council on Criminal Justice Reform and provide for its members, chairperson, other officers, committees, staff, funding, duties, powers, and sunset of such commission; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Criminal Procedure; Georgia Council on Criminal Justice Reform; create
Sponsors
Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] |
Sen. Jack Hill [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #170 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |