GA SB238 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 5 of Article 7 of Chapter 3 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to board of regents scholarships, so as to authorize certain additional types of student financial assistance for medical and dental students at the Medical College of Georgia; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Regents Scholarship; authorize additional types of student financial assistance for medical/dental students; Medical College of Ga.
Sponsors
Sen. Seth Harp [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #933 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #471 - Pass (Y: 101 N: 67 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #177 - Passage (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #471 - Pass (Y: 101 N: 67 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #177 - Passage (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-24 | Act 439 | |
2010-05-24 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | House Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-29 | House Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed | |
2009-04-03 | House Insists | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub | |
2009-04-03 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-04-03 | House Third Readers | |
2009-04-01 | House Postponed | |
2009-03-26 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-17 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-12 | House First Readers | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Read and Referred |