GA SB241 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Lumpkin County Water and Sewerage Authority, approved March 21, 1984 (Ga. L. 1984, p. 4500), as amended, so as to change the composition of the authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lumpkin County Water And Sewerage Authority; composition; change

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #294 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #194 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06 Effective Date
2019-05-06 Act 199
2019-05-06SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-09SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2019-03-26HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-26HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-21HouseHouse First Readers
2019-03-18SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-18SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-12SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback