GA SB248 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating the Georgia Firefighters' Pension Fund, so as to increase the monthly dues amount for members; to increase the tax on premiums charged by fire insurance companies for certain classes of coverage; to increase the maximum monthly benefit amount payable to beneficiaries; to provide for related matters; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Firefighters' Pension Fund; monthly dues, tax on premiums and maximum monthly benefit amount payable; increase
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #538 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |