GA SB25 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-6-163 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to duty of driver of vehicle meeting or overtaking school bus, reporting of violations, and civil monetary penalty for violations captured by school bus camera, so as to clarify when the driver of a vehicle need not stop upon meeting or passing a school bus; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Rules of the Road; when driver of a vehicle need not stop upon meeting or passing a school bus; clarify
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House Vote #30 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #16 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #16 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Effective Date | |
2019-02-15 | Act 1 | |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-02-13 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2019-02-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Senate Hopper |