GA SB250 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the State Court of Fulton County, approved March 24, 1976 (Ga. L. 1976, p. 3023), as amended, so as to provide for the appointment of associate judges and their compensation; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Court of Fulton County; appointment of associate judges and their compensation; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Jordan [D] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Nikema Williams [D] | Sen. Sally Harrell [D] |
Sen. Zahra Karinshak [D] | Rep. Derrick Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #357 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #249 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #249 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 286 | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-04-02 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-28 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |