GA SB263 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the Probate Court of Troup County to charge a technology fee; to specify the uses to which said technology fee may be put; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Probate Court of Troup County; technology fee and uses; charge and specify
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #357 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #274 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #274 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 209 | |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-04-02 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-28 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |