GA SB29 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 36-92-1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions regarding waiver of immunity for motor vehicle claims, so as to revise a definition to clarify that a sheriff, deputy sheriff, or other agent, servant, or employee of a sheriff's office shall be included in such waiver for purposes of the waiver of sovereign immunity for local government motor vehicle claims; to clarify and conform such waiver of sovereign immunity in response to Davis v. Morrison, 344 Ga. App. 527 (2018); to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Waiver of Immunity for Motor Vehicle Claims; definition to clarify sheriff, deputy sheriff, other agent, servant, or employee of sheriff's office; include
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Jones [D] | Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] | Sen. Michael Rhett [D] | Sen. Donzella James [D] |
Sen. Gloria Butler [D] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Rep. William Boddie [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #299 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #116 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #116 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 254 | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senate Hopper |