GA SB290 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 8 of Title 4 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to responsible dog ownership, so as to allow local governments to confer dog control authority upon multiple individuals; to provide for the hearing of contested cases by superior courts; to require dog owners to pay for reasonable confinement and housing expenses in certain cases; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Dog Ownership; allow local governments to confer dog control authority upon multiple individuals
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. John Crosby [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #775 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #817 (Y: 162 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #446 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #817 (Y: 162 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #446 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-21 | Act 554 | |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub |
2014-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |