GA SB295 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 15 and 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to courts and revenue and taxation, respectively, so as to revise the cost-of-living and general performance based increases to take into account the increases provided for in 2020; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Courts and Revenue and Taxation; cost-of-living and general performance based increases; revise
Sponsors
Sen. John Wilkinson [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Rep. Ginny Ehrhart [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #722 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Vote #661 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #465 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Vote #661 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #465 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 543 | |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2020-06-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-17 | House | House Postponed |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |