GA SB301 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 6 of Title 42 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding detainers, so as to revise temporary custody provisions of inmates who have been charged with subsequent felony offenses while under sentence and in custody of the department; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Detainers; inmates charged with subsequent felony offenses under sentence and in custody; temporary custody provisions; revise
Sponsors
Sen. Blake Tillery [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Rep. William Werkheiser [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #708 (Y: 157 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #505 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #505 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 511 | |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senate Hopper |