GA SB308 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 7 of Title 52 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to abandoned vessels, so as to remove certain redundant processes regarding unattended vessels in public waters; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Abandoned Vessels; unattended vessels in public waters; remove certain redundant processes
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Sen. Valencia Seay [D] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - House - House Vote #766 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #488 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #488 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 512 | |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-25 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |