GA SB309 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 36 of the O.C.G.A., relating to local government, so as to provide for comprehensive regulation of local government infrastructure financing; to include broadband network projects as undertakings for which revenue bonds may be issued; to create the Georgia Municipal and Local Government Infrastructure Finance Authority and the Georgia County and Local Government Infrastructure Finance Authority; to provide for automatic repeal; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
'Georgia Municipal and Local Government Infrastructure Finance Authority Act'; comprehensive regulation of local government infrastructure financing; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Sen. Horacena Tate [D] | Sen. Lee Anderson [R] | Sen. Blake Tillery [R] |
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |