GA SB31 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-21 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-21 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to enact the "Georgia Nuclear Energy Financing Act"; to amend Code Section 46-2-25 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the procedure for changing any rate, charge, classification, or service, so as to provide for a utility to recover from its customers the costs of financing associated with the construction of a nuclear generating plant; to provide a short title; to provide for the calculation and collection of the financing costs; to provide for review by the Georgia Public Service Commission as to whether the costs recovered are being properly recorded; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Nuclear Energy Financing Act; procedure for changing any rate, charge, classification, service
Sponsors
Sen. Don Balfour [R] | Rep. J.B. Powell [R] | Sen. Chip Rogers [R] | Sen. Mitch Seabaugh [R] |
Sen. Ed Tarver [D] | Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-02-26 - House - House Vote #88 - Im Trans (Y: 120 N: 44 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-02-26 - House - House Vote #87 - Pass (Y: 107 N: 66 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-02-26 - House - House Vote #86 - Commit To Rules (Y: 44 N: 116 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2009-02-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #35 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 38 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-02-26 - House - House Vote #87 - Pass (Y: 107 N: 66 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-02-26 - House - House Vote #86 - Commit To Rules (Y: 44 N: 116 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2009-02-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #35 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 38 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-21 | Effective Date | |
2009-04-21 | Act 13 | |
2009-04-21 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-08 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2009-02-26 | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate | |
2009-02-26 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-02-26 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-17 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-12 | House First Readers | |
2009-02-11 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-02-11 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-02-06 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-02-05 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-26 | Senate Read and Referred |