GA SB31 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 35 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding law enforcement officers and agencies, so as to clarify that law enforcement officers shall not be liable at law for any action or actions done while performing any duty at the scene of an emergency under certain circumstances; to provide for definitions; to provide for no liability of law enforcement officers for rescuing persons or pets out of certain vehicles; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers and Agencies; performing any duty at the scene of an emergency; law enforcement officers shall not be liable; clarify
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #377 (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #350 (Y: 134 N: 23 NV: 7 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #94 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #350 (Y: 134 N: 23 NV: 7 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #94 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-28 | Act 66 | |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senate Hopper |