GA SB316 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 43 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to medicare supplement insurance, so as to require insurers who offer medicare supplemental insurance policies in this state to make available supplemental policies to persons under the age of 65 who qualify for medicare due to disability or end-stage renal disease; to provide for time frames when persons may enroll in a medicare supplement insurance policy; to provide for payment by third parties; to provide for limitations on differences in premiums charged to different applicants; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Medicare Supplemental; make available to persons under age 65 who qualify for medicare due to disability or end-stage renal disease
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #876 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #522 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #522 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-20 | Act 374 | |
2010-05-20 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-13 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-09 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-08 | House First Readers | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-02-10 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-14 | Senate Read and Referred |