GA SB316 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - House Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - House Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to professions and businesses, so as to provide for military spouses licensed in other states to practice certain professions and occupations to obtain a license by endorsement to practice in this state; to provide for definitions; to provide for conforming amendments; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Military Spouses; licensed in other states to practice certain professions; obtain a license by endorsement to practice in this state; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Rep. Heath Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #494 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-19 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2020-06-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |