GA SB32 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 51 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to torts, so as to provide for conditions upon immunity from civil liability in instances of rendering emergency care; to limit liability for property damage caused by the rescue or attempted rescue of animals locked in motor vehicles; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Torts; conditions upon immunity from civil liability in instances of rendering emergency care; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] | Sen. Chuck Payne [R] |
Sen. Nan Orrock [D] | Sen. Sally Harrell [D] | Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #287 (Y: 46 N: 108 NV: 13 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #51 (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #51 (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | House Third Reading Lost |
2019-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-22 | House | House Postponed |
2019-03-21 | House | House Postponed |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |