GA SB335 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - House Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - House Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 3 of Title 12, Chapter 11 of Title 15, and Chapter 5 of Title 49 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding parks, historic areas, memorials, and recreation, Juvenile Code, and programs and protection for children and youth, respectively, so as to strengthen laws and supports for foster children and foster families; to authorize the Department of Human Services to partner with child-placing agencies to assist with casework services; to provide varying levels of training required for experienced foster parents or respite caregivers; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Children and Youth; foster children and foster families; laws and supports; strengthen
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #470 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-24 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hopper |