GA SB338 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 13 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions for administrative procedure, so as to modify requirements for agency rule making; to modify legislative objections to and staying of proposed agency rules; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Administrative Procedure; agency rule making; modify requirements
Sponsors
Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] |
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #853 (Y: 150 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #770 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Vote #432 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #770 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Vote #432 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Veto V19 | |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | House Receded from Amend or Sub |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub |
2018-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-12 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |