GA SB346 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 26-4-60 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to grounds for suspension, revocation, or refusal to grant licenses by the State Board of Pharmacy, so as to change certain provisions relating to selling, distributing, and delivering prescription drugs by mail or other common carriers; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Board of Pharmacy; prescription drugs by mail/other common carriers; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - House - House Vote #728 - Passage (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #553 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #553 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-02 | Act 740 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-04 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-21 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-19 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-05 | House First Readers | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-17 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-26 | Senate Read and Referred |