GA SB348 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to education, so as to provide for college and career academies as charter schools or as schools within a strategic waivers school system or charter system; to provide for requirements; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; provide for colleges and career academies as charter school or schools within a strategic waivers school system
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] | Sen. Michael Williams [R] |
Sen. Freddie Sims [D] | Rep. Mike Dudgeon [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #823 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #478 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #478 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 613 | |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-07 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2016-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-23 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |