GA SB351 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - House Second Readers
Pending: House State Planning and Community Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - House Second Readers
Pending: House State Planning and Community Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for the holding of a nonbinding, advisory referendum election to determine whether the qualified electors of the State of Georgia desire to continue the advancement of time from standard time to daylight saving time or to observe standard time or daylight saving time year round; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Secretary of State; nonbinding, advisory referendum election; continue the advancement of time from standard time to daylight saving time; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Lester Jackson [D] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] |
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Blake Tillery [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #506 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate Hopper |