GA SB352 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 33-20C-2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to online provider directories, so as to provide for certain coverage requirements concerning providers that become out-of-network during a plan year; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Online Provider Directories; certain coverage requirements concerning providers that become out-of-network during a plan year; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #485 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate Hopper |