GA SB357 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 5 of Chapter 14 of Title 2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to timber products generally, so as to repeal the "Georgia Treated Timber Products Act of 1973"; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Agriculture; repeal the "Georgia Treated Timber Products Act of 1973"
Sponsors
Sen. John Bulloch [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Bill Heath [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - House - House Vote #758 - Passage (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #467 - Passage (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #467 - Passage (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-02 | Act 742 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-09 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-26 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-14 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-16 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-15 | House First Readers | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-03 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-02 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-31 | Senate Read and Referred |