GA SB358 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state symbols, so as to designate the muscadine grape as the official state grape; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Symbols; muscadine grape as the official state grape; designate
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. Freddie Sims [D] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] |
Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Sen. Zahra Karinshak [D] | Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-19 - House - House Vote #676 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #566 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #566 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-05 | Act 598 | |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-12 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate Hopper |