GA SB368 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 10-1-393 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to unfair or deceptive practices under the "Fair Business Practices Act of 1975," so as to change provisions relating to deceptive representations or designations of geographic origin; to revise provisions relative to unlawful telephone directory listings of nonlocal businesses; to require registration of assumed or fictitious trade names; to prohibit the use of assumed or fictitious trade names to intentionally misrepresent geographic origin or location; to provide for other related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Fair Business Practices Act of 1975; deceptive representation/designations of geographic origins; provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Goggans [R] | Sen. William Jackson [R] | Sen. Jack Murphy [R] | Sen. Chip Rogers [R] |
Sen. Horacena Tate [D] | Sen. Tommie Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #922 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #562 - Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #562 - Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-20 | Act 419 | |
2010-05-20 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-20 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-22 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-18 | House First Readers | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-05 | Senate Read and Referred |