GA SB37 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 13 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the statute of frauds, so as to clarify that a mutual agreement to modify or alter an existing promise, agreement, contract, or commitment that is subject to the statute of frauds shall itself be in writing and subject to the statute of frauds; to provide that a mutual agreement to cancel, revoke, or rescind a promise, agreement, contract, or commitment that is subject to the statute of frauds shall itself be in writing and subject to the statute of frauds; to respond to the holdings in Crop Production Services, Inc. v. Moye, 345 Ga. App. 228 (March 15, 2018); to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Statute of Frauds; clarify that a mutual agreement to modify an existing promise, agreement, contract; shall be in writing and subject to statute of frauds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #348 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #290 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #84 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #290 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #84 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 255 | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate Hopper |