GA SB370 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to public utilities and public transportation, so as to provide for compliance with certain safety and permit requirements when electric easements are utilized for broadband services; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public Utilities and Public Transportation; compliance with certain safety and permit requirements; electric easements are utilized for broadband services; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Sen. Jennifer Jordan [D] | Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #714 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #546 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #546 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 516 | |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Hopper |