GA SB377 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 8-2-102 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to inspections, so as to reduce the number of required annual elevator inspections; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Inspections; number of required annual elevator inspections; reduce
Sponsors
Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #721 (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Vote #662 (Y: 134 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #496 (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #497 (Y: 45 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Vote #662 (Y: 134 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #496 (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #497 (Y: 45 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-30 | Act 406 | |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2020-06-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Hopper |