GA SB38 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to courts, so as to exclude certain types of filings from the electronic filing requirements of superior and state courts; to allow individuals who are not attorneys to file such pleadings and documents in paper form; to provide that fees for electronic filings shall not be charged to the Attorney General, district attorneys, solicitors-general, or public defenders; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Courts; electronic filing requirements of superior and state courts; certain types of filings; exclude
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #695 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - House - House Vote #667 (Y: 152 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #25 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - House - House Vote #667 (Y: 152 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #25 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-05 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-05 | Act 608 | |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2020-06-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate Hopper |