GA SB388 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general income tax provisions, so as to increase the penalties imposed for certain actions relating to false or fraudulent material matter on returns, affidavits, claims, or documents; to provide that such actions must be taken knowingly to be unlawful; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
General Income Tax Provisions; certain actions relating to false or fraudulent material matter on returns, affidavits, claims, or documents; penalties; increase
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] |
Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #587 (Y: 22 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #588 (Y: 23 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #589 (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #588 (Y: 23 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #589 (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-12 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Hopper |