GA SB397 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 8 of Chapter 3 of Title 35 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the alert system for unapprehended murder and rape suspects under the administration of the Georgia Bureau of Investigation, so as to create a state-wide "Blue Alert" system to speed the apprehension of violent criminals who kill or seriously injure local, state, or federal law enforcement officers; to provide for definitions; to provide for procedure; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Blue Alert"; create state-wide system to speed the apprehension of violent criminals; local, state, and federal law enforcement officers
Sponsors
Sen. John Douglas [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Jack Murphy [R] |
Sen. Valencia Seay [D] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #558 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-27 | Act 473 | |
2010-05-27 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-13 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-13 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-31 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-18 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-17 | House First Readers | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-10 | Senate Read and Referred |