GA SB404 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 71 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to development impact fees, so as to provide for development impact fees for education; to provide for definitions; to provide for the manner of calculation, imposition, and collection of such fees; to provide for related matters; to provide for a contingent effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Development Impact Fees; education; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |