GA SB408 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 34-1-10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to use of sick leave for care of immediate family members, so as to repeal the sunset provision relating to such sick leave requirements; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sick Leave for Care of Immediate Family Members; sunset provision relating to such sick leave requirements; repeal
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Rep. William Werkheiser [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #724 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-20 - House - House Vote #681 (Y: 129 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #602 (Y: 50 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-20 - House - House Vote #681 (Y: 129 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #602 (Y: 50 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 378 | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2020-06-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-19 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-06-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |