GA SB411 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to provide for a short title; to provide for exemptions from certain unfair trade practices for certain wellness and health promotion programs, condition or disease management programs, health risk appraisal programs, and similar provisions in certain individual accident and sickness insurance and group accident and sickness insurance policies; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Healthy Georgians Act of 2010"; provide exemptions from certain unfair trade practices for certain wellness and health promotion programs
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Goggans [R] | Sen. Ralph Hudgens [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Mitch Seabaugh [R] |
Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. John Wiles [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #900 - Agree To House Amendment (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #581 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #581 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-02 | Act 548 | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-13 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-24 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-22 | House First Readers | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Read and Referred |