GA SB411 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 4 of Chapter 3 of Title 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to corporate purposes and powers of electric membership corporations, so as to require electric membership corporations to comply with certain requirements in determining the rates for attachments to utility poles by communications service providers; to provide for certain terms and conditions for such attachments; to provide for definitions; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Electric Membership Corporations; comply with certain requirements in determining the rates for attachments to utility poles by communications service providers; require
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #606 (Y: 26 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #606 (Y: 26 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |