GA SB419 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to issuance, expiration, and renewal of drivers' licenses, so as to provide for the notation on drivers' licenses of a diagnosis of post traumatic stress disorder; to provide for certification; to provide for procedures; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Drivers' Licenses; provide for notation; post traumatic stress disorder; members of armed services/veterans
Sponsors
Sen. Gail Buckner [D] | Sen. John Douglas [R] | Sen. Ed Harbison [D] | Sen. Steve Henson [D] |
Sen. Jack Murphy [R] | Sen. Ronald Ramsey [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #947 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #648 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #648 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-04 | Act 649 | |
2010-06-04 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-29 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-29 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-27 | House Postponed | |
2010-04-21 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-04-20 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2010-04-01 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-31 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-30 | House First Readers | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-22 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Read and Referred |