GA SB426 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 9 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to air quality, so as to provide for the reporting of any unpermitted release of ethylene oxide to the Environmental Protection Division of the Department of Natural Resources; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Air Quality; reporting of any unpermitted release of ethylene oxide to the Environmental Protection Division of the Department of Natural Resources; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Sen. Blake Tillery [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Michael Rhett [D] |
Sen. Donzella James [D] | Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] | Rep. Don Parsons [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #717 (Y: 150 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #601 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #601 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-05 | Act 577 | |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-23 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |