GA SB427 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 50-13-18 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to procedure upon grant, denial, renewal, revocation, suspension, annulment, or withdrawal of licenses, so as to require agency procedures for timely processing of and status reports regarding applications for issuance or renewal of licenses; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Administrative Procedure; require agency procedures for timely processing; applications for issuance/renewal of licenses
Sponsors
Sen. Ronnie Chance [R] | Sen. Hardie Davis [D] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. Chip Rogers [R] |
Rep. Doug Stoner [D] | Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #840 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House Vote #793 - Passage (Y: 98 N: 71 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House Vote #792 - Am# 25 1281 (Y: 57 N: 105 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #548 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House Vote #793 - Passage (Y: 98 N: 71 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House Vote #792 - Am# 25 1281 (Y: 57 N: 105 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #548 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 635 | |
2012-05-01 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-09 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2012-03-27 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-19 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-05 | House First Readers | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Read and Referred |