GA SB43 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 82 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revenue bonds, so as to revise the definition of the term "undertaking" as it relates to electric systems; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue Bonds; definition of the term "undertaking" as it relates to electric systems; revise
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Payne [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Lee Anderson [R] | Rep. Kasey Carpenter [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - House Vote #653 (Y: 66 N: 91 NV: 5 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2020-06-16 - House - House Vote #650 (Y: 91 N: 75 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #55 (Y: 42 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Vote #650 (Y: 91 N: 75 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #55 (Y: 42 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-05 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-05 | Act 586 | |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-16 | House | House Notice to Reconsider |
2020-06-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-15 | House | House Postponed |
2020-01-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hopper |